TN HB0334 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 395
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 395
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits displaying messages supporting or opposing referenda and initiatives on LEA or school signs or LEA-owned buildings; prohibits video or audio messages supporting or opposing referenda and initiatives being sent via LEA or school telephonic or electronic systems or accounts. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Title 49.
Title
As enacted, prohibits displaying messages supporting or opposing referenda and initiatives on LEA or school signs or LEA-owned buildings; prohibits video or audio messages supporting or opposing referenda and initiatives being sent via LEA or school telephonic or electronic systems or accounts. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Title 49.
Sponsors
Rep. Jimmy Matlock [R] | Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-10 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-02 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-02 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-22 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 395 |
2013-04-17 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2013-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2013 |
2013-04-11 | House | Reset on Reg. cal. for 4/17/13 |
2013-04-10 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/2013 |
2013-04-09 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/10/2013 |
2013-04-03 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2013-04-02 | House | Action Def. in Education Committee to 4/3/2013 |
2013-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 4/2/2013 |
2013-03-26 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Education Committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/19/2013 |
2013-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee |
2013-02-04 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Committee |
2013-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-30 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0547 (Crossfiled) 2013-05-22 - Pub. Ch. 395