TN HB0334 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - Pub. Ch. 477
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - Pub. Ch. 477
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires bonds of executors and administrators to include obligation to pay expenses for court costs, attorney's fees and other related expenses of administering the estate incurred due to failure to properly account for or utilize funds coming into hands of the estate. - Amends TCA Title 30, Chapter 1, Part 2.
Title
As enacted, requires bonds of executors and administrators to include obligation to pay expenses for court costs, attorney's fees and other related expenses of administering the estate incurred due to failure to properly account for or utilize funds coming into hands of the estate. - Amends TCA Title 30, Chapter 1, Part 2.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Coley [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 2 BY Kelsey (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 2 (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 2 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-09 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Judiciary Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-21 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 2 BY Kelsey (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 2 (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 2 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-09 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Judiciary Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-21 | Pub. Ch. 477 | |
2011-06-21 | Effective date(s) 07/01/11 | |
2011-06-16 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-06-06 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2011-05-25 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-05-24 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-05-24 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2011-05-21 | H. concurred in S. am. no. 2 Ayes 77, Nays 0 | |
2011-05-21 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 26, Nays 1 | |
2011-05-21 | S. adopted am. 2 | |
2011-05-20 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 5/21/2011 | |
2011-05-20 | S. Reset on cal. for 5/21/2011 | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 5/20/2011 | |
2011-05-19 | S. Reset on cal. for 5/20/2011 | |
2011-05-19 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2011-04-21 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2011-04-18 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2011-04-18 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 97, Nays 0 | |
2011-04-18 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0134) | |
2011-04-14 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2011 | |
2011-04-14 | Reset on Regular cal. for 4/18/2011 | |
2011-04-07 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/14/2011 | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/7/2011 | |
2011-03-29 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-03-23 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 3/29/2011 | |
2011-03-22 | Action Def. in Judiciary Committee to 3/29/2011 | |
2011-03-16 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 3/22/2011 | |
2011-03-15 | Action Def. in Judiciary Committee to 3/22/2011 | |
2011-03-09 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 3/15/2011 | |
2011-03-09 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2011-03-02 | Placed on s/c cal Judiciary Subcommittee for 3/9/2011 | |
2011-02-23 | Action Def. in s/c General Sub of Judiciary to 3/9/2011 | |
2011-02-16 | Placed on s/c cal General Sub of Judiciary 1 for 2/23/2011 | |
2011-02-16 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Judiciary | |
2011-02-10 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2011-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-07 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0387 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 477