TN HB0332 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 116
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 116
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires, subject to certain exceptions, a public school to credit a student who participates in an activity or program sponsored by 4-H as present for attendance purposes. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 30.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 30, relative to student participation in 4-H.
Sponsors
Rep. Rebecca Alexander [R] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Rep. Curtis Halford [R] | Rep. William Lamberth [R] |
Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] | Rep. Tim Hicks [R] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 116 | |
2021-03-29 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-03-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-25 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/29/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/25/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/9/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0203 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-21 - Effective date(s) 04/13/2021