TN HB0330 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-05 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-05 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes amusement tax on dues or fees to membership sports and recreation clubs. - Amends TCA Section 67-6-212 and Section 67-6-330.
Title
As introduced, removes amusement tax on dues or fees to membership sports and recreation clubs. - Amends TCA Section 67-6-212 and Section 67-6-330.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Charlie Baum [R] | Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R] | Rep. Dale Carr [R] |
Rep. Pat Marsh [R] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Bob Freeman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-02-04 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1099 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee