TN HB0324 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 216
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 216
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes various changes to present law pertaining to leave for state employees. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 27 and Title 8, Chapter 50, Part 8.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 27 and Title 8, Chapter 50, Part 8, relative to public employment benefits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 216 | |
2023-04-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-03 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2023-03-30 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/3/2023 |
2023-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/30/2023 |
2023-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-22 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2023-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/15/2023 |
2023-03-07 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/7/2023 |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2023-02-28 | House | Ref. to State Government Committee |
2023-01-30 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2023-01-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-01-21 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0276 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-22 - Sponsor(s) Added.