TN HB0324 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1080
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1080
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes the grading scale that must be used to assign letter grades to students enrolled in grades nine through 12 for purposes of reporting students' grades for postsecondary financial assistance; specifies that the state board or an LEA may develop a grading system for purposes other than reporting students' grades for postsecondary financial assistance. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to grading systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1080 | |
2022-04-27 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-04-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-26 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-19 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2022-04-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/19/2022 |
2022-04-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-04-06 | House | Rec. for pass, if am.; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Action def. in Education Administration to 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Action def. in Education Administration to 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Action Def. in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee to 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Re-ref. Higher Education Subcommittee |
2022-02-02 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 2/9/2022 |
2022-02-01 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2022-01-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/1/2022 |
2022-01-20 | House | Sponsor change. |
2021-03-23 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Action Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/9/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0388 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-01 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022