TN HB0311 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-21 - Failed In s/c Employee Affairs of C&EA of Consumer & Employees Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-21 - Failed In s/c Employee Affairs of C&EA of Consumer & Employees Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits local governments from requiring private employer to pay its employees any wage not required to be paid to such employee under state or federal law. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 2, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, prohibits local governments from requiring private employer to pay its employees any wage not required to be paid to such employee under state or federal law. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 2, Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-21 - House - EMPLOYEE AFFAIRS OF C&EA: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Consumer & Employees Affairs Committee (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-21 | Failed In s/c Employee Affairs of C&EA of Consumer & Employees Affairs Committee | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on s/c cal Employee Affairs of C&EA for 04/21/2009 | |
2009-04-14 | Action Def. in s/c Employee Affairs of C&EA to 4/21/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on s/c cal Employee Affairs of C&EA for 04/14/2009 | |
2009-03-10 | Assigned to s/c Employee Affairs of C&EA | |
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to Consumer & Employee Affairs | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-04 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0083 (Crossfiled) 2009-03-16 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.