TN HB0309 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, decriminalizes the possession of certain amounts of marijuana by making such possession a civil violation punishable by a $25 fine or community service; makes other related changes. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4, relative to marijuana.
Sponsors
Rep. Jesse Chism [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/28/2023 |
2023-02-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 2/28/2023 |
2023-02-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/21/2023 |
2023-01-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-01-21 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-01-20 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1072 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-24 - Sponsor(s) Added.