TN HB0307 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 272
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 272
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing released time courses. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions governing released time courses. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 272 | |
2019-04-18 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2019 |
2019-04-08 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/8/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | No Action Taken |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | No Action Taken |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-12 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 3/12/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Reassigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee |
2019-03-05 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-26 | House | Action Def. in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee to 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee |
2019-02-04 | House | P2C, ref. to Education-- Government Operations for Review |
2019-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1373 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 272