TN HB0306 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, decreases the amount of time, from 10 to five business days, within which a local administrative agency has to provide the personnel file of a previous employee seeking employment in another local administrative agency, if so requested, for the purpose of determining if sexual misconduct was committed by the person seeking employment. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, decreases the amount of time, from 10 to five business days, within which a local administrative agency has to provide the personnel file of a previous employee seeking employment in another local administrative agency, if so requested, for the purpose of determining if sexual misconduct was committed by the person seeking employment. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-04HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2019-01-31HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-30HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0523 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback