TN HB0306 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 334
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes professional bondsmen to charge up to 15 percent rather than 10 percent of the face value of a criminal appearance bond if the defendant is not a resident of the state. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 11, Part 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, authorizes professional bondsmen to charge up to 15 percent rather than 10 percent of the face value of a criminal appearance bond if the defendant is not a resident of the state. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 11, Part 3.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-06 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 334
2015-04-20HouseComp. SB subst.
2015-04-17HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2015
2015-04-17HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2015
2015-04-15HouseReset on cal. for 4/20/15
2015-04-15HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2015
2015-04-15HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2015
2015-04-14HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2015-04-08HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/14/2015
2015-04-08HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2015-04-01HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/8/2015
2015-04-01HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2015-04-01HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2015-03-25HousePlaced on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/1/2015
2015-03-24HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2015-03-18HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/24/2015
2015-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2015-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2015-02-09HouseIntro., P1C.
2015-02-04HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0531 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-06 - Pub. Ch. 334

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback