TN HB0252 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Action Def. in s/c State Government of S&LG to 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Action Def. in s/c State Government of S&LG to 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifically includes the general assembly within the provisions of Tennessee's open meetings statute. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 1 and Title 8, Chapter 44.
Title
As introduced, specifically includes the general assembly within the provisions of Tennessee's open meetings statute. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 1 and Title 8, Chapter 44.
Sponsors
Rep. Glen Casada [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | Action Def. in s/c State Government of S&LG to 2010 | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on s/c cal State Government of S&LG for 05/06/2009 | |
2009-02-17 | Assigned to s/c State Government of S&LG | |
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0296 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-12 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0252&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0252.pdf |