TN HB0247 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 416
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, establishes daylight saving time as the standard time in Tennessee, subject to authorization to do so from the United States Congress and certain other conditions being met. - Amends TCA Section 4-1-401.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, establishes daylight saving time as the standard time in Tennessee, subject to authorization to do so from the United States Congress and certain other conditions being met. - Amends TCA Section 4-1-401.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Pub. Ch. 416
2019-05-29 Effective date(s) 05/21/2019
2019-05-21 Signed by Governor.
2019-05-14HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-05-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-05-08HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-05-07HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-04-30SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 1
2019-04-30SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-04-24SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-23HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-22HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 86, Nays 5, PNV 5
2019-04-22HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0443)
2019-04-18HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019
2019-04-17HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2019
2019-04-17HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-10HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/16/2019
2019-04-09HouseAction def. in Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/16/2019
2019-04-04HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/9/2019
2019-04-04HouseRe-ref. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2019
2019-04-02HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-27HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 4/2/2019
2019-03-26HouseAction def. in State Committee to 4/2/2019
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 3/26/2019
2019-03-19HouseAction def. in State Committee to 3/26/2019
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 3/19/2019
2019-03-13HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/13/2019
2019-03-04HouseRe-ref. to Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
2019-02-20HouseReturned to the Clerk's Desk
2019-02-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/20/2019
2019-02-13HouseAction Def. in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee to 2/20/2019
2019-02-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/13/2019
2019-02-01HouseAssigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
2019-01-31HouseP2C, ref. to State Committee
2019-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-29HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1100 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 416

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback