TN SB1100 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, establishes daylight saving time as the standard time in Tennessee, subject to authorization to do so from the United States Congress. - Amends TCA Section 4-1-401.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, establishes daylight saving time as the standard time in Tennessee, subject to authorization to do so from the United States Congress. - Amends TCA Section 4-1-401.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-04-16SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/17/2019
2019-04-16SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/17/2019
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/16/2019
2019-04-10SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/16/2019
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/10/2019
2019-04-09SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/10/2019
2019-04-02SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
2019-04-02SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/9/2019
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/2/2019
2019-03-26SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/2/2019
2019-03-19SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
2019-03-19SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/26/2019
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0247 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-18 - H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback