TN HB0233 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows dealers, when reporting and remitting sales taxes to the department of revenue, to retain a certain portion of such taxes in order to compensate for costs incurred in accounting for and remitting such taxes; establishes certain maximum limitations for certain dealers. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 5.
Title
As introduced, allows dealers, when reporting and remitting sales taxes to the department of revenue, to retain a certain portion of such taxes in order to compensate for costs incurred in accounting for and remitting such taxes; establishes certain maximum limitations for certain dealers. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 5.
Sponsors
Rep. David Hawk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-04-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/18/2015 |
2015-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2015-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-02 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0327 (Crossfiled) 2015-03-24 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0233&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0233.pdf |