TN HB0229 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, over a three-year period, deletes requirement that 52 percent of the 5 percent commission retained by county registers for collecting and reporting recordation tax must be remitted to state treasurer and credited to state general fund. - Amends TCA Section 67-4-409.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, over a three-year period, deletes requirement that 52 percent of the 5 percent commission retained by county registers for collecting and reporting recordation tax must be remitted to state treasurer and credited to state general fund. - Amends TCA Section 67-4-409.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-02-27HousePlaced on cal. Local Committee for 3/6/2019
2019-02-27HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Committee
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 2/27/2019
2019-02-01HouseAssigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee
2019-01-31HouseP2C, ref. to Local Committee
2019-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-29HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0249 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-19 - Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/26/2019

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback