TN HB0223 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Assigned to s/c Corrections Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Juvenile Justice Stop Solitary Confinement Act." - Amends TCA Title 37 and Title 41, Chapter 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37 and Title 41, Chapter 4, relative to the Juvenile Justice Stop Solitary Confinement Act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-10HouseAssigned to s/c Corrections Subcommittee
2021-02-10HouseP2C, ref. to State Government Committee
2021-02-08HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-19HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1418 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback