TN SB1418 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Juvenile Justice Stop Solitary Confinement Act." - Amends TCA Title 37 and Title 41, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37 and Title 41, Chapter 4, relative to the Juvenile Justice Stop Solitary Confinement Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0223 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-10 - Assigned to s/c Corrections Subcommittee