TN HB0221 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 273
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 273
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes off-highway vehicles to be operated on certain segments of state highways in Morgan County. - Amends TCA Section 55-8-185.
Title
As enacted, authorizes off-highway vehicles to be operated on certain segments of state highways in Morgan County. - Amends TCA Section 55-8-185.
Sponsors
Rep. John Windle [D] | Rep. John Ragan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 273 | |
2019-04-17 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Infrastructure Subcommittee for 3/19/2019 |
2019-02-12 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Infrastructure Subcommittee of Transportation Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Infrastructure Subcommittee for 2/12/2019 |
2019-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Infrastructure Subcommittee |
2019-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1375 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 273