TN HB0207 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-04 - Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-04 - Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the director of the office of legislative budget analysis to provide the revised BEP funding formula to the speaker of the senate, the speaker of the house of representatives, and the education committees of the senate and the house of representatives, if the commissioner fails to provide the revised BEP funding formula for the ensuing fiscal year by January 1. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 8; Title 37 and Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires the director of the office of legislative budget analysis to provide the revised BEP funding formula to the speaker of the senate, the speaker of the house of representatives, and the education committees of the senate and the house of representatives, if the commissioner fails to provide the revised BEP funding formula for the ensuing fiscal year by January 1. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 8; Title 37 and Title 49.
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Carr [R] | Sen. Doug Overbey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee |
2013-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Committee |
2013-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-29 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0437 (Crossfiled) 2013-02-04 - P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0207&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB0207.pdf |