TN HB0197 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Pub. Ch. 246
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Pub. Ch. 246
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Successor Corporation Asbestos-Related Liability Fairness Act." - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 34.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Successor Corporation Asbestos-Related Liability Fairness Act." - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 34.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-21 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Civil Justice Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-21 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Civil Justice Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | Senate | Pub. Ch. 246 |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Effective date(s) 07/01/2013 |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Passed S., Ayes 27, Nays 2, PNV 2 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. |
2013-03-14 | House | Rcvd. from H., P1C. |
2013-03-11 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2013-03-11 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 2 |
2013-03-11 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0014) |
2013-02-28 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/11/2013 |
2013-02-28 | House | Reset on Reg cal. for 3/11/13 |
2013-02-21 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/28/2013 |
2013-02-20 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/21/2013 |
2013-02-20 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 2/20/2013 |
2013-02-13 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2013-02-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/13/2013 |
2013-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2013-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2013-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-28 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0622 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 246