TN HB0196 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 398
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 398
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires that a fine be imposed on a person convicted of abuse, neglect, or exploitation of an adult if the victim was over 60 years of age; authorizes appropriation of the fines to fund services and programs for senior citizens. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13; Title 71, Chapter 2 and Title 71, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, requires that a fine be imposed on a person convicted of abuse, neglect, or exploitation of an adult if the victim was over 60 years of age; authorizes appropriation of the fines to fund services and programs for senior citizens. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13; Title 71, Chapter 2 and Title 71, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Brenda Gilmore [D] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] | Rep. Johnnie Turner [D] |
Rep. Joe Towns [D] | Rep. Barbara Cooper [D] | Rep. JoAnne Favors [D] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 398 | |
2015-04-20 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2015-04-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2015 |
2015-04-15 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/20/15 |
2015-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2015 |
2015-04-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2015 |
2015-04-14 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-04-13 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/14/2015 |
2015-04-08 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/8/2015 |
2015-03-31 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-24 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/10/2015 |
2015-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2015-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee--Criminal Justice Committee |
2015-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-01-29 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0881 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 398
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0196&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0196.pdf |