TN HB0190 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the administrator or executor of an estate to swear an oath that the representative is not disqualified from serving due to receiving a sentence of imprisonment. - Amends TCA Title 30 and Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the administrator or executor of an estate to swear an oath that the representative is not disqualified from serving due to receiving a sentence of imprisonment. - Amends TCA Title 30 and Title 40.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-03-18HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-03-18HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0053)
2019-03-14HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/18/2019
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2019
2019-03-06HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-02-27HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 3/6/2019
2019-02-26HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Children & Families Subcommittee for 2/26/2019
2019-02-12HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Children & Families Subcommittee of Judiciary
2019-02-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Children & Families Subcommittee for 2/12/2019
2019-02-01HouseAssigned to s/c Children & Families Subcommittee
2019-01-31HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-28HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0174 (Crossfiled) 2019-01-31 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback