TN HB0172 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-07 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-07 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Medical Cannabis Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4; Title 67 and Title 68, Chapter 7.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4; Title 67 and Title 68, Chapter 7, relative to medical cannabis.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-21 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/21/2023 |
2023-01-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2023-01-21 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee -- Criminal Justice Committee -- Government Operations for Review |
2023-01-20 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1461 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee