TN HB0166 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Pub. Ch. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Pub. Ch. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires certain public entities to disclose to the office of the comptroller events of default; makes other related revisions. - Amends TCA Section 9-21-151.
Title
As enacted, requires certain public entities to disclose to the office of the comptroller events of default; makes other related revisions. - Amends TCA Section 9-21-151.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | Pub. Ch. 6 | |
2019-04-01 | Effective date(s) 03/20/2019 | |
2019-03-20 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-03-13 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-03-04 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-26 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-02-25 | House | Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-02-21 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/25/2019 |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/21/2019 |
2019-02-19 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 2/19/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/13/2019 |
2019-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2019-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-28 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0201 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 6