TN HB0147 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 413
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Animal Abuser Registration Act." - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 44.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Animal Abuser Registration Act." - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 44.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-20 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 413
2015-04-20HouseComp. SB subst.
2015-04-20HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2015-04-17HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2015
2015-04-15HouseReset on cal. for 4/20/15
2015-04-15HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2015
2015-04-15HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2015
2015-04-14HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2015-04-13HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/14/2015
2015-04-13HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2015-04-06HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2015-04-02HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2015-04-01HouseRec. for pass; ref to Government Operations Committee
2015-03-30HousePlaced on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 4/1/2015
2015-03-27HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2015-03-26HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2015-03-25HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
2015-03-23HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2015-03-18HousePlaced on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/25/2015
2015-03-18HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2015-03-17HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2015-03-12HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2015-03-11HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2015-03-11HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2015
2015-02-25HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2015-02-23HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2015-02-12HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2015-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2015-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee--Agriculture--Government Operations for review
2015-02-11HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2015-02-09HouseIntro., P1C.
2015-01-23HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1204 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-20 - Pub. Ch. 413

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback