TN SB1204 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Pub. Ch. 413
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Animal Abuser Registration Act." - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 44.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Animal Abuser Registration Act." - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 44.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-20 Pub. Ch. 413
2015-05-20 Effective date(s) 05/08/2015; 01/01/2016
2015-05-08SenateSigned by Governor.
2015-04-27SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2015-04-22HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2015-04-22SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2015-04-21SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2015-04-20HousePassed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
2015-04-20HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0172)
2015-04-20HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2015-04-15HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2015-04-13SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2015-04-13SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2015-04-13SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 28, Nays 1
2015-04-13SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0360)
2015-04-13SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0359)
2015-04-10SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/13/2015
2015-04-08SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2015-04-08SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/8/2015
2015-04-07SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/8/2015
2015-04-06SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2015-04-01SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/7/2015
2015-03-23SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2015-03-20SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2015-03-17SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2015-03-12SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2015-03-12SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2015-03-11SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2015-02-18SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2015-02-12SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2015-02-12SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0147 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 413

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback