TN HB0145 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 29
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 29
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires, after July 1, 2015, that an applicant for a beer permit must have been a citizen or lawful resident of the U.S. for at least one year immediately preceding the application date in order for the county to issue the permit. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 5.
Title
As enacted, requires, after July 1, 2015, that an applicant for a beer permit must have been a citizen or lawful resident of the U.S. for at least one year immediately preceding the application date in order for the county to issue the permit. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Marsh [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 29 | |
2015-03-19 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2015-03-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/19/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/12/2015 |
2015-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/10/2015 |
2015-03-04 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/4/2015 |
2015-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2015-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2015-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-01-23 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0185 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-01 - Pub. Ch. 29
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0145&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0145.pdf |