TN HB0128 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Effective date(s) 03/31/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Effective date(s) 03/31/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits a homeowners' association from prohibiting the use of a sign posted to warn the public of health, safety, or dangerous natural conditions associated with water on the property in certain circumstances; clarifies date of application of prohibition on HOA prohibiting property owners from displaying flags. - Amends TCA Title 66, Chapter 27.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 66, Chapter 27, relative to dedicatory instruments.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Howell [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] |
Rep. Chris Todd [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Effective date(s) 03/31/2021 | |
2021-04-06 | Pub. Ch. 80 | |
2021-03-31 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-03-23 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-03-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-03-17 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0041) |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-03-09 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-03-08 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-03-08 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0005) |
2021-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/8/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/4/2021 |
2021-03-02 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/2/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-23 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 2/23/2021 |
2021-02-16 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2021-02-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 2/16/2021 |
2021-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2021-01-14 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-01-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0450 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 80