TN HB0128 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Pub. Ch. 242
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Pub. Ch. 242
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires rather than permits that restitution to the victim be paid by the defendant for the offenses of patronizing prostitution, trafficking for commercial sex acts, solicitation of a minor for sexual purposes, and enlisting or paying a minor to engage in child pornography. - Amends TCA Section 39-11-118.
Title
As enacted, requires rather than permits that restitution to the victim be paid by the defendant for the offenses of patronizing prostitution, trafficking for commercial sex acts, solicitation of a minor for sexual purposes, and enlisting or paying a minor to engage in child pornography. - Amends TCA Section 39-11-118.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Coley [R] | Sen. Brian Kelsey [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-06 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Criminal Justice Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-14 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-06 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Criminal Justice Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | Senate | Pub. Ch. 242 |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Effective date(s) 07/01/2013 |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. |
2013-03-21 | House | Rcvd. from H., P1C. |
2013-03-18 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2013-03-18 | House | Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0 |
2013-03-14 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/18/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2013 |
2013-03-12 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/12/2013 |
2013-03-06 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2013-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/6/2013 |
2013-02-21 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2013-02-20 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/20/2013 |
2013-02-12 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2013-02-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/12/2013 |
2013-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2013-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2013-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-28 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1035 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 242