TN HB0123 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires comprehensive stroke centers and primary stroke centers, and encourages other hospitals, to report data on individuals with confirmed stroke to the ETSU College of Public Health on a quarterly basis. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 1.
Title
As enacted, requires comprehensive stroke centers and primary stroke centers, and encourages other hospitals, to report data on individuals with confirmed stroke to the ETSU College of Public Health on a quarterly basis. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Sabi Kumar [R] | Rep. Matthew Hill [R] |
Rep. Timothy Hill [R] | Rep. John Crawford [R] | Rep. Cameron Sexton [R] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] |
Rep. JoAnne Favors [D] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 5 | |
2017-02-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-27 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-02-23 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/27/2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/23/2017 |
2017-02-21 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/21/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-15 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/15/2017 |
2017-02-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-03 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2017-02-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2017-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-01-27 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0544 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-04 - Pub. Ch. 5