TN HB0123 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Pub. Ch. 248
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Pub. Ch. 248
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing eligibility for unemployment compensation for certain persons who provide certain services for an educational institution or its students. - Amends TCA Section 50-7-302.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions governing eligibility for unemployment compensation for certain persons who provide certain services for an educational institution or its students. - Amends TCA Section 50-7-302.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 79 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CONSUMER & EMPLOYEE AFFAIRS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-23 - House - (VOICE VOTE) C&EA SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Consumer & Employee Affairs Com (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 79 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CONSUMER & EMPLOYEE AFFAIRS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-23 - House - (VOICE VOTE) C&EA SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Consumer & Employee Affairs Com (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-25 | Pub. Ch. 248 | |
2011-05-25 | Effective date(s) 05/23/11 | |
2011-05-23 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-05-11 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2011-05-11 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-05-10 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-05-05 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2011-05-05 | Passed S., Ayes 29, Nays 1 | |
2011-05-05 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2011-05-04 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2011-05-04 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2011-05-04 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 79, Nays 13, PNV 1 | |
2011-05-04 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0111) | |
2011-04-28 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/28/2011 | |
2011-04-26 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/26/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 4/20/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Action Def. in s/c Finance Subcommittee to 4/20/2011 | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 4/13/2011 | |
2011-04-06 | Action Def. in s/c Finance Subcommittee to 4/13/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 4/6/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Assigned to s/c Finance Subcommittee | |
2011-03-29 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-03-23 | Placed on cal. Consumer & Employee Affairs Committee for 3/29/2011 | |
2011-03-23 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Consumer & Employee Affairs Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Placed on s/c cal C&EA Subcommittee for 3/23/2011 | |
2011-02-09 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of C&EA | |
2011-02-09 | P2C, ref. to Consumer & Employees Affairs Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-01-18 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0107 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 248