TN HB0117 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 287
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, increases, from one time to once every three years, the required in-service training for a teacher employed by a local board of education in regard to the detection, intervention, prevention, and treatment of human trafficking in which the victim is a child. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to training on the detection, intervention, prevention, and treatment of human trafficking.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18 Pub. Ch. 287
2021-05-18 Effective date(s) 04/30/2021
2021-04-30 Signed by Governor.
2021-04-20HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2021-04-20SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-04-15HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-04-14HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2021-04-14SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0
2021-04-14SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2021-03-25SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2021-03-23HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2021-03-22HousePassed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
2021-03-18HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/22/2021
2021-03-17HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/18/2021
2021-03-10HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-03-03HousePlaced on cal. Education Instruction for 3/10/2021
2021-03-02HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Instruction
2021-02-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 3/2/2021
2021-01-27HouseAssigned to s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee
2021-01-13HouseRef. to Education Instruction
2021-01-13HouseP2C held on desk.
2021-01-12HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-11HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0337 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 287

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback