TN HB0117 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that TennCare's monthly statement to the chairs of the senate and house finance, ways and means committees on the estimated fiscal impact of applications for certificates of need approved by the health services development agency in the previous month may be submitted via email. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, clarifies that TennCare's monthly statement to the chairs of the senate and house finance, ways and means committees on the estimated fiscal impact of applications for certificates of need approved by the health services development agency in the previous month may be submitted via email. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | House | Withdrawn. |
2019-01-30 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-01-28 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |