TN HB0113 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Assigned to s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Assigned to s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates annual retail tobacco license, which must be obtained by retailers before engaging in the retail sale of tobacco products; establishes tax on closed-system and open-system vapor products. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 29; Title 39, Chapter 17; Title 39, Chapter 15; Title 43; Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 10 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 29; Title 39, Chapter 17; Title 39, Chapter 15; Title 43; Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 10 and Title 68, relative to the sale of tobacco, smoking hemp, and vapor products.
Sponsors
Rep. Robin Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2021-01-13 | House | ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2021-01-13 | House | P2C held on desk. |
2021-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1279 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee