TN HB0109 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-05 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires a city in which there is located a special school district whose boundaries are coterminous with the city's boundaries to maintain effort in funding such school system. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 3, Part 3 and Title 49, Chapter 2, Part 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires a city in which there is located a special school district whose boundaries are coterminous with the city's boundaries to maintain effort in funding such school system. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 3, Part 3 and Title 49, Chapter 2, Part 2.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-05 Withdrawn.
2011-02-08 Assigned to s/c General Sub of Education
2011-02-07 P2C, ref. to Education Committee
2011-01-15 Intro., P1C.
2011-01-14 Filed for intro.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback