TN HB0105 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-30 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-30 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases from $10 to $250 per year the limit on the fee that an agency or department of local government that is responsible for enforcing building codes in the jurisdiction where the landlord's dwelling units are located may charge the landlord for registering with the agency or government; increases from $50 to $100 per week the fine that a landlord who fails to register is to be assessed. - Amends TCA Title 66, Chapter 28.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 66, Chapter 28, relative to the Uniform Residential Landlord and Tenant Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-30 | House | Withdrawn. |
2023-01-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee |
2023-01-20 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-11 | House | Filed for introduction |