TN HB0100 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-16 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-16 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, changes the limit calculations for intermediate methamphetamine precursors from the total amount of the base ephedrine and pseudoephedrine in a product to the amount of ephedrine or pseudoephedrine base, or their salts, isomers, or salts of isomers contained in a product. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-431.
Title
As enacted, changes the limit calculations for intermediate methamphetamine precursors from the total amount of the base ephedrine and pseudoephedrine in a product to the amount of ephedrine or pseudoephedrine base, or their salts, isomers, or salts of isomers contained in a product. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-431.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-13 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 59 | |
2015-03-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-23 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2015-03-19 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/23/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/19/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/11/2015 |
2015-03-04 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Health Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/4/2015 |
2015-02-24 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/24/2015 |
2015-01-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2015-01-17 | House | Ref. to Criminal Justice Committee--Health |
2015-01-17 | House | P2C held on desk pending appointment of standing committees |
2015-01-16 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-01-15 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0111 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-13 - Pub. Ch. 59
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0100&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0100.pdf |