TN HB0096 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/2/2021
Pending: House K-12 Subcommittee Committee
Hearing: Mar 2 @ 4:30 pm in House Hearing Room II
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits an LEA from employing a person who is a relative of the LEA's director of schools or a relative of a member of the LEA's local board of education unless the commissioner of education approves the relative's employment in writing. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 2, Part 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 2, Part 2, relative to persons eligible for employment by a local education agency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24HousePlaced on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/2/2021
2021-01-27HouseAssigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
2021-01-13HouseRef. to Education Administration
2021-01-13HouseP2C held on desk.
2021-01-12HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1141 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback