TN HB0095 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, eliminates the sales tax on feminine hygiene products. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, eliminates the sales tax on feminine hygiene products. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Rep. Johnny Shaw [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/10/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 6/10/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/3/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/25/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/20/2019 |
2019-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-01-28 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0060 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee