TN HB0095 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 187
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 187
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the time of sale of land to foreclose a deed of trust, mortgage, or other lien securing the payment of money or other thing of value or under judicial orders or process from "10:00 a.m. - 4:00 p.m." to "9:00 a.m. - 7:00 p.m.". - Amends TCA Title 26, Chapter 5 and Title 35, Chapter 5.
Title
As enacted, extends the time of sale of land to foreclose a deed of trust, mortgage, or other lien securing the payment of money or other thing of value or under judicial orders or process from "10:00 a.m. - 4:00 p.m." to "9:00 a.m. - 7:00 p.m.". - Amends TCA Title 26, Chapter 5 and Title 35, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Pub. Ch. 187 | |
2017-05-03 | Effective date(s) 04/19/2017 | |
2017-04-19 | Signed by Governor. | |
2017-04-12 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-04-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-04-04 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0249) |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-03-16 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-03-16 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 86, Nays 7, PNV 0 |
2017-03-16 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0061) |
2017-03-09 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/16/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/9/2017 |
2017-03-07 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/7/2017 |
2017-03-01 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/1/2017 |
2017-02-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2017-02-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2017-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-01-23 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0236 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 187