TN HB0095 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Pub. Ch. 273
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Pub. Ch. 273
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the effective date of the streamlined sales and use tax agreement legislation from July 1, 2015, to July 1, 2017; makes various revisions to sales tax and other tax provisions. - Amends TCA Title 67; Chapter 72 of the Public Acts of 2011; Chapter 480 of the Public Acts of 2013; Chapter 530 of the Public Acts of 2009 and Chapter 602 of the Public Acts of 2007.
Title
As enacted, extends the effective date of the streamlined sales and use tax agreement legislation from July 1, 2015, to July 1, 2017; makes various revisions to sales tax and other tax provisions. - Amends TCA Title 67; Chapter 72 of the Public Acts of 2011; Chapter 480 of the Public Acts of 2013; Chapter 530 of the Public Acts of 2009 and Chapter 602 of the Public Acts of 2007.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Pub. Ch. 273 | |
2015-05-06 | Effective date(s) 04/28/2015; 10/01/2015 | |
2015-04-28 | Signed by Governor. | |
2015-04-21 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-04-20 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-04-20 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-04-09 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2015-04-09 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2015-04-09 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0237) |
2015-04-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-02 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/9/2015 |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/2/2015 |
2015-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/3/2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/25/2015 |
2015-02-18 | House | Meeting Cancelled Reset on Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee cal. for next meeting. |
2015-02-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/18/2015 |
2015-01-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2015-01-17 | House | Ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-01-17 | House | P2C held on desk pending appointment of standing committees |
2015-01-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-01-16 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-01-15 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0106 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 273