TN HB0084 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, redefines alcoholic beverage and expands open container law to apply to all passengers and the driver to comply with federal regulations. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 4.
Title
As introduced, redefines alcoholic beverage and expands open container law to apply to all passengers and the driver to comply with federal regulations. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: State Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: State Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2014-03-18 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-04 | House | Action Def. in State Government Committee to 3/18/2014 |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/4/2014 |
2014-02-26 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2014-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/26/2014 |
2013-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2013-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2013-01-28 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-24 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1157 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-18 - Failed In S. Jud Comm., no motion