TN HB0083 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 49-11)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/22/2021; 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 49-11)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/22/2021; 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends eligibility for tuition reimbursement provided to members of the Tennessee national guard under the STRONG Act of 2017 to include technical certificates and diplomas and certain graduate programs; extends, from June 30, 2021, to June 30, 2025, the date on which the act will be repealed. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 10.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 10, relative to tuition assistance for Tennessee national guard members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Effective date(s) 04/22/2021; 07/01/2021 | |
2021-05-03 | Pub. Ch. 216 | |
2021-04-22 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-04-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-14 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-09 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-01 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-01 | House | Passed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-25 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/1/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/25/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/3/2021 |
2021-02-23 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 2/23/2021 |
2021-02-16 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2021-02-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 2/16/2021 |
2021-02-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee |
2021-01-13 | House | Ref. to Education Administration |
2021-01-13 | House | P2C held on desk. |
2021-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0755 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 216