TN HB0083 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-06 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-06 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, redesignates the title of "county executive" to "county mayor." - Amends Chapter 126 of the Private Acts of 2004.
Title
Subject to local approval, redesignates the title of "county executive" to "county mayor." - Amends Chapter 126 of the Private Acts of 2004.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | House | Withdrawn. |
2019-01-28 | House | P2C, ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee |
2019-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1480 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill