TN HB0080 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Action Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 2018
Pending: House Consumer and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, establishes a minimum wage of $15.00 as of July 1, 2017; provides a minimum wage for employees in the service industry who receive tips and employees that are compensated solely by gratuities; authorizes the department of labor and workforce development to promulgate rules in compliance with federal law. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, establishes a minimum wage of $15.00 as of July 1, 2017; provides a minimum wage for employees in the service industry who receive tips and employees that are compensated solely by gratuities; authorizes the department of labor and workforce development to promulgate rules in compliance with federal law. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 2.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-05HouseAction Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 2018
2017-03-29HousePlaced on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 4/5/2017
2017-03-29HouseAction Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 4/5/2017
2017-03-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/29/2017
2017-02-01HouseAssigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee
2017-02-01HouseP2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee-- Government Operation for Review
2017-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-01-20HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1411 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-05 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback