TN HB0079 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-12 - Caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-12 - Caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends from 30 to 60 days the period by which a business entity that maintains a fleet of 200 or more motor vehicles and that has contracted with the department of revenue to provide titling and registration of the vehicle fleet to comply with certificate of title requirements before incurring a delinquency penalty. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 55; Title 57 and Title 65.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 7; Title 55; Title 57 and Title 65, relative to transportation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-12 | House | Caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2023-01-11 | House | P2C held on desk, pending appointment of Standing Committees |
2023-01-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0260 (Crossfiled) 2023-01-21 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee