TN HB0076 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-19 - Action Def. in s/c Finance Subcommittee to 5/19/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, removes department's authority to transfer funds from the health-related boards fund and division of regulatory boards fund to any other department or agency of state government. - Amends TCA Section 4-3-1016; Section 56-1-310 and Section 63-1-137.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, removes department's authority to transfer funds from the health-related boards fund and division of regulatory boards fund to any other department or agency of state government. - Amends TCA Section 4-3-1016; Section 56-1-310 and Section 63-1-137.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-19 Action Def. in s/c Finance Subcommittee to 5/19/2011
2011-05-19 Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 5/19/2011
2011-05-18 Placed Behind the Budget
2011-05-18 Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 5/18/2011
2011-04-13 Action Def. in s/c Finance Subcommittee to last calendar
2011-04-06 Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 4/13/2011
2011-03-30 Action Def. in s/c Finance Subcommittee to 4/13/2011
2011-03-23 Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 3/30/2011
2011-02-07 Assigned to s/c General Sub of Finance
2011-02-07 P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2011-01-15 Intro., P1C.
2011-01-14 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0898 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-06 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. F,W&M Comm.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback