TN HB0076 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-02-23 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits the imposition of a late fee for cable or video service until at least 30 days after the service to which the late fee applies has been received and requires notice when a late fee is to be imposed. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 52; Title 7, Chapter 59; Title 47, Chapter 18 and Title 65, Chapter 25.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, prohibits the imposition of a late fee for cable or video service until at least 30 days after the service to which the late fee applies has been received and requires notice when a late fee is to be imposed. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 52; Title 7, Chapter 59; Title 47, Chapter 18 and Title 65, Chapter 25.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-02-23 Withdrawn.
2009-02-09 P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2009-01-15 Intro., P1C.
2009-01-14 Filed for intro.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback