TN HB0072 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-27 - Assigned to s/c Corrections Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates process by which the commissioner of correction may certify as eligible for parole certain chronically debilitated or incapacitated inmates; clarifies that medical conditions for which an inmate may be granted a furlough by the commissioner of correction must be chronically debilitating or incapacitating. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 28, Part 1; Title 40, Chapter 35, Part 5 and Section 41-21-227(i).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 40, Chapter 28, Part 1; Title 40, Chapter 35, Part 5 and Section 41-21-227(i), relative to chronically ill inmates.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-27HouseAssigned to s/c Corrections Subcommittee
2021-01-13HouseRef. to State Government Committee
2021-01-13HouseP2C held on desk.
2021-01-12HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0727 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback